SC S1120 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Create In The Executive Branch A Department On Aging; To Require, On Or Before January 1, 2019, The Code Commissioner To Prepare And Deliver A Report To The President Of The Senate And The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives Recommending Any Additional Appropriate And Conforming Changes To The 1976 Code Of Laws Reflecting The Provisions Of This Act; And On Or Before January 1, 2019, To Require The Joint Legislative Committee On Aging To Prepare And Deliver A Report To The President Of The Senate And The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives Recommending Any Additional Changes To The Department On Aging Created By This Act To Enhance Efficient And Cost Effective Delivery Of Services To The Aging Community In Accordance With The Federal Older Americans Act.
Title
SC Lieutenant Governor Restructuring Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0107 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Act No. 261
H3159 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Member
H4977 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Act No. 142
H3159 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Member
H4977 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Act No. 142
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 11 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 17 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 23 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 3 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 30 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 4 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 190 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 36 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 36 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 36 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 36 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 36 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 56 | 840 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 6 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 11 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 17 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |