SC S1103 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Section Of Penderboro Road (sc 34-39) From The Intersection Of 501 Bypass To The Intersection Of Wellwood Road In Marion, South Carolina, "reverend Dr. A.c. Robinson Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Section Of Road Containing The Designation.
Title
Reverend Dr. A. C. Robinson Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2018-03-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |