SC S1099 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 61-4-942 So As To Prohibit A Manufacturer, Brewer, Or Importer Of Beer From Requiring A Wholesaler To Undertake Certain Actions. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Table Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 12 N: 83 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-07 Act No. 169
2020-10-07 Effective date 09/30/20
2020-09-30 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 166
2020-09-23SenateRoll call Ayes-30 Nays-4
2020-09-23SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2020-09-23HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2020-09-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-09-22HouseRoll call Yeas-76 Nays-13
2020-09-22HouseRead second time
2020-09-22HouseAmended
2020-09-22HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2020-09-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2020-06-24HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-06-24HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-05-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-05-12SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
2020-05-12SenateRead second time
2020-05-12SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-03-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-11SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2020-02-14SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Turner (ch), Hutto, Talley, Cash, Harpootlian
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
614942(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=1099&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/1099_20200212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/1099_20200311.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/1099_20200312.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/1099_20200512.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/1099_20200915.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/1099_20200922.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/1099_20200923.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17687
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17989
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17990
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18101

Bill Comments

feedback