SC S1099 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 265
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 265
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Exemptions For Motor Carriers That Use Independent Contractors And Individuals Transporting Vehicles For Automobile Dealers Under Certain Circumstances
Title
Unemployment benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Act No. 265 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/06/14 | |
2014-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 285 | |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2014-05-22 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-05-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-2 |
2014-05-21 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-21 | House | Amended |
2014-05-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |