SC S1085 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That For Purposes Of Chapter 11, Title 48, Including The Conduct Of Elections, The Digital Hydrologic Map Prepared By The Service Center Agencies Of The United States Department Of Agriculture Of The Fishing Creek Watershed District In York County Represents And Is Declared To Be The Boundaries Of The District
Title
York County watershed conservation districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Act No. 155 | |
2012-05-17 | Effective date 05/14/12 | |
2012-05-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Ratified R 175 | |
2012-05-02 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-05-01 | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time | |
2012-05-01 | Debate adjourned | |
2012-04-26 | Debate adjourned | |
2012-04-25 | Recalled from York Delegation | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to York Delegation | |
2012-03-28 | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-02-08 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-02-07 | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-07 | Read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced and read first time |