SC S1079 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Our Senior Nutrition Programs, The Seniors They Serve, And The Volunteers Who Care For Them And To Declare March 2016 As "march For Meals Month" In South Carolina.
Title
March for Meals Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Invitations |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Polled out of committee Invitations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Invitations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |