SC S1068 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 50-1-30, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Classification Of Birds, Animals, And Fish, So As To Classify Certain Birds As Migratory Waterfowl; To Repeal Section 50-11-20 Relating To The Migratory Waterfowl Committee; And To Repeal Section 50-9-670 Relating To Migratory Waterfowl Permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal classification; classify certain birds as waterfowl

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2020-06-24HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-05-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-05-12SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-36 Nays-1
2020-05-12SenateRead second time
2020-05-12SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-03-10SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2020-01-30SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H5135 (Similar To) 2020-05-12 - Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-2

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50130(n/a)See Bill Text
501120(n/a)See Bill Text
509670(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback