SC S1065 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-7
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-7
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 37-3-501, AS AMENDED, OF THE 1976 CODE, RELATING TO THE DEFINITION OF SUPERVISED LOAN, TO PROVIDE THAT CERTAIN CLOSED-END CREDIT TRANSACTIONS ARE NOT SUPERVISED LOANS; AND TO AMEND SECTION 37-3-503, RELATING TO A LICENSE TO MAKE SUPERVISED LOANS, TO PROVIDE THAT CERTAIN LICENSED DEFERRED PRESENTMENT PROVIDERS MAY NOT CONDUCT THE BUSINESS OF MAKING SUPERVISED LOANS, TO PROVIDE PENALTIES, AND TO PROVIDE NECESSARY DEFINITIONS.
Title
Relating To The Definition Of Supervised Loan, To Provide That Certain Closed-end Credit Transactions Are Not Supervised Loans; And To Amend Section 37-3-503, Relating To A License To Make Supervised Loans, To Provide That Certain Licensed Deferred Presentment Providers May Not Conduct The Business Of Making Supervised Loans, To Provide Penalties, And To Provide Necessary Definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Anderson [D] | Sen. Michael Fair [R] | Sen. Robert Hayes [R] | Sen. Joel Lourie [D] |
Sen. Gerald Malloy [D] | Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] | Sen. David Thomas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-7 | |
2010-04-20 | Introduced and read first time HJ-7 | |
2010-04-15 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-13 | |
2010-04-14 | Read second time SJ-73 | |
2010-04-14 | Amendment Withdrawn SJ-73 | |
2010-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-17 | Amended SJ-41 | |
2010-02-17 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-41 | |
2010-02-16 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance SJ-4 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance SJ-3 | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced and read first time SJ-3 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1065&session=118 |