SC S1064 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 213
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 213
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establish That An Insurer Writing Workers' Compensation Insurance May Satisfy Its Filing Obligation By Becoming A Member Of Or Subscriber To A Licensed Rating Organization
Title
Insurers writing workers' compensation policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Act No. 213 | |
2016-06-09 | Effective date 06/03/16 | |
2016-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 237 | |
2016-06-02 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-06-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-0 |
2016-06-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-31 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |