SC S1064 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Nicholson, Gregory
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Nicholson, Gregory
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For The Governing Structure Of A Public Service District Of A Certain Size That Provides Service In Two Or More Counties.
Title
Not-for-profit corporations providing water service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Nicholson, Gregory | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Nicholson, Gregory | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4205 (Similar To) 2012-05-21 - Act No. 168
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 36 | 1315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 36 | 1330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=1064&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/1064_20120110.htm |