SC S1058 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Proclaim Tuesday, March 22, 2016, As "sc Professional Land Surveyors Day" In South Carolina And To Recognize The Importance Of The Services Provided By This Group Of Professionals.
Title
SC Professional Land Surveyors Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Invitations |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Polled out of committee Invitations |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Invitations |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |