SC S1051 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 17 in Blatt Room 410
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 50-25-1330, Relating To Watercraft Restrictions On Lake H. Taylor Blalock, So As To Extend The Hunting Of Waterfowl For Five Years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lake Blalock

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2024-03-28HouseIntroduced and read first time
2024-03-27SenateRead third time and sent to House
2024-03-26SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2024-03-26SenateRead second time
2024-03-20SenateCommittee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
2024-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2024-02-14SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50251330(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback