SC S1048 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 15-3-710 So As To Provide The Basis For Liability For A Person Or Establishment Who Illegally Furnishes Alcohol To An Individual Who Injures A Third Party Based Upon What The Furnisher Knew Or Should Have Known Under The Cirucumstances; To Specify When The Right Of Action Is Not Available; And To Provide The Evidentiary Standard For The Visible Intoxication.
Title
Illegal Furnishing of Alcoholic Beverages Liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Hutto, Campsen, Talley, Harpootlian, Garrett, M.Johnson |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |