SC S1048 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 151
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 13-1-1030, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Members Serving On The Aeronautics Commission, So As To Provide That A Resident Commission Member May Not Serve For More Than Two Consecutive Terms; And To Amend Section 13-1-1050, Relating To The Terms Of The Aeronautics Commission, So As To Make Conforming Changes. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aeronautics Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-02 Act No. 151
2020-10-02 Effective date 09/28/20
2020-09-28 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 163
2020-09-24HouseRead third time and enrolled
2020-09-23HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
2020-09-23HouseRead second time
2020-09-23HouseDebate adjourned
2020-09-22HouseRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-24HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-24HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-05-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-05-12SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
2020-05-12SenateRead second time
2020-02-13SenateCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-01-28SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H4399 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1311030(n/a)See Bill Text
1311050(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback