SC S1045 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred to Georgetown Delegation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 7-7-270(b), As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In Georgetown County, So As To Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting precincts; Georgetown County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseReferred to Georgetown Delegation
2020-06-24HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-05-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-05-12SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
2020-05-12SenateRead second time
2020-03-17 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-12SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77270(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback