SC S1044 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 207
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establish A Year-round "catch And Release" Zone On The Lower Reach Of The Saluda River; To Provide That The Department Of Natural Resources Shall Make A Study Of The Lower Saluda River Trout Fishery; And To Provide For The Repeal Of This Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trout, catch and release zone on the Saluda River

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31 Act No. 207
2018-05-24 Effective date 07/01/18
2018-05-17 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 225
2018-05-10HouseRead third time and enrolled
2018-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
2018-05-09HouseRead second time
2018-05-08HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 5-9-18
2018-05-03HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-03HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-03HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-29SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-03-28SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2018-03-28SenateRead second time
2018-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-03-21SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5013260(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback