SC S1041 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit A Person From Soliciting Or Unlawfully Obtaining The Money, Property, Or Personal Identifying Information Of A Vulnerable Adult, To Provide A Civil Remedy For The Vulnerable Adult, And To Provide A Criminal Penalty
Title
Vulnerable adults
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Act No. 162 | |
2018-05-09 | Effective date 05/03/18 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-01 | Ratified R 173 | |
2018-04-26 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-04-25 | House | Roll call Yeas-74 Nays-0 |
2018-04-25 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-25 | House | Debate interrupted |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |