SC S1038 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 HJ-48
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 HJ-48
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO INVITE THE NATIONAL COMMANDER OF THE AMERICAN LEGION, THE HONORABLE CLARENCE HILL, TO ADDRESS THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY IN JOINT SESSION IN THE CHAMBER OF THE SOUTH CAROLINA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES AT 12:30 P.M. ON TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 23, 2010.
Title
Invite The National Commander Of The American Legion, The Honorable Clarence Hill, To Address The General Assembly In Joint Session In The Chamber Of The South Carolina House Of Representatives At 12:30 P.m. On Tuesday, February 23, 2010.
Sponsors
Sen. John Knotts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 HJ-48 | |
2010-02-18 | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-48 | |
2010-02-17 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-206 | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-52 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced HJ-51 | |
2010-01-28 | Adopted, sent to House SJ-26 | |
2010-01-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-01-27 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations SJ-15 | |
2010-01-27 | Polled out of committee Invitations SJ-15 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Invitations SJ-66 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced SJ-66 |
Same As/Similar To
H4290 (Similar To) 2010-01-28 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence SJ-27
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1038&session=118 |