SC S1034 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 324
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 324
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Adopt Revised Code Volumes 5 And 8 Of The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To The Extent Of Their Contents, As The Only General Permanent Statutory Law Of The State As Of January 1, 2014
Title
Revised Code Volumes 5 and 8
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | Act No. 324 | |
2014-05-27 | Effective date 05/16/14 | |
2014-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-15 | Ratified R 182 | |
2014-05-07 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-05-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2014-05-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-6-14 |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4634 (Similar To) 2014-02-18 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary