SC S1033 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Act No. 220
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Act No. 220
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That An Out-of-state Business Or Employee That Performs Disaster Or Emergency-related Work In This State Is Exempt From Certain Licensing And Taxing Provisions During The Disaster Period, To Define Terms, And To Provide Notice Requirements
Title
Out-of-state businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Campbell [R] | Sen. Hugh Leatherman [R] | Sen. Nikki Setzler [D] | Sen. William O'Dell [R] |
Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Act No. 220 | |
2014-06-11 | Effective date 06/02/14 | |
2014-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 228 | |
2014-05-28 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-05-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2014-05-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-22 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-27-14 |
2014-05-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-3 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |