SC S1028 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 208
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 208
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Create A Program Within The Department Of Agriculture To Integrate Veterans Into The Field Of Agriculture And Support Veterans Working In The Field Of Agriculture, To Provide That Clemson University May Develop A Program To Further Advance The Agriculture Industry And Help Veterans Promote Their Agriculture Products, To Establish In The State Treasury The South Carolina Veterans And Warriors To Agriculture Program And Fund, Its Funding Mechanism And How Funds Are To Be Spent, And To Provide That The Department Of Agriculture Shall Promulgate Regulations To Implement The Provisions Of This Section
Title
Department of Agriculture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Act No. 208 | |
2016-06-09 | Effective date 06/03/16 | |
2016-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 232 | |
2016-06-02 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-06-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2016-06-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Amended |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-03-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |