SC S1024 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Act No. 226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Act No. 226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-7-320, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In Horry County, So As To Delete Six Precincts, To Add Seven Precincts, And To Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office; By Adding Section 2-1-46 So As To Establish Election Districts From Which The Members Of The House Of Representatives Are Elected Beginning With The 2024 General Election; To Repeal Section 2-1-45 Relating To Election Districts From Which Members Of The House Of Representatives Were Formerly Elected; To Authorize The President Of The Senate And Speaker Of The House To Intervene In Any State Or Federal Action Concerning This Legislation; To Authorize The President Of The Senate To Initiate Or Otherwise Participate In Litigation On Behalf Of The Senate Regarding Redistricting; And To Authorize The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives To Initiate Or Otherwise Participate In Litigation On Behalf Of The House Regarding Redistricting. - Ratified Title
Title
Horry County Voting Precincts; House Reapportionment
Sponsors
Sen. Luke Rankin [R] | Sen. Stephen Goldfinch [R] | Sen. Greg Hembree [R] | Sen. Ronnie Sabb [D] |
Sen. Kent Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Act No. 226 | |
2022-06-28 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2022-06-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-06-16 | Ratified R 257 | |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-11 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-7 |
2022-05-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | House | Amended |
2022-05-04 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Horry Delegation |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to Horry Delegation |
2022-03-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 1 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 1 | 46 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 7 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |