SC S1007 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Act No. 218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Act No. 218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide A Process For Expediting Mortgage Foreclosures And To Define Necessary Terminology
Title
Mortgage foreclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Act No. 218 | |
2014-06-11 | Effective date 06/02/14 | |
2014-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 226 | |
2014-05-22 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-05-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-2 |
2014-05-21 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-21 | House | Reconsidered |
2014-05-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-27-14 |
2014-05-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-03-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2014-02-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4670 (Similar To) 2014-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance