SC S1001 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 215 (monticello Road) In Richland County From Its Intersection With Elliott Avenue To Its Intersection With Columbia College Drive "george E. Glymph Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
George E Glymph Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Sen. John Scott [D] | Sen. Richard Harpootlian [D] | Sen. Darrell Jackson [D] | Sen. Thomas McElveen [D] |
Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |