SC S1000 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Interchange Located At Exit 92 Along Interstate Highway 85 In Cherokee County "lance Corporal Christopher S. Fowlkes Memorial Interchange" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Interchange That Contain The Words "lance Corporal Christopher S. Fowlkes Memorial Interchange".
Title
Lance Corporal Christopher S. Fowlkes Interchange
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence | |
2012-02-21 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced | |
2012-02-07 | Adopted, sent to House | |
2012-02-07 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-02-02 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced | |
2011-11-28 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-11-28 | Prefiled |