SC S0997 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To The Department Of Social Services, By Adding Section 43-1-730 To Provide That Refugees Placed In This State By The Federal Government Must Register With The Department Of Social Services; To Amend Title 15, Chapter 5 Of The 1976 Code, To Provide Civil Liability For Voluntary Resettlement Organizations Arising From The Actions Of A Refugee Placed In This State To Whom The Organization Provided Sponsorship Or Resettlement Services; To Prohibit State Or Local Funds Being Expended For The Direct Or Indirect Benefit Of Refugees Until Legislation Specifically Authorizing The Expenditure Is Enacted; And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Refugees and Voluntary resettlement organizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-04-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-03-24SenateRead third time and sent to House
2016-03-23SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2016-03-23SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-6
2016-03-23SenateRead second time
2016-03-23SenateCommittee Amendment Amended and Adopted
2016-03-22SenateDebate interrupted
2016-03-17SenateDebate interrupted
2016-03-16SenateDebate interrupted
2016-03-15SenateDebate interrupted
2016-02-16SenateRoll call Ayes-32 Nays-4
2016-02-16SenateSpecial order, set for February 16, 2016
2016-01-28SenateCommittee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable General
2016-01-28SenatePolled out of committee General
2016-01-28SenatePolled out of committee General
2016-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on General
2016-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431730(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback