SC S0993 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 61-4-730, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Sales By Permitted Wineries, So As To Provide That A Permitted Winery Is Eligible For A Special Permit Subject To Certain Limitations; To Amend Section 61-4-1515, Relating To Sales By Permitted Breweries, So As To Increase The Maximum Amount Of Beer That May Be Sold To An Individual For Off-premises Consumption; And To Amend Section 61-4-550, Relating To Permits To Sell Beer And Wine At A Fair Or Special Function, So As To Require An Applicant To Notify The State Law Enforcement Division That Alcohol Will Be Served At A Fair Or Special Function. - Ratified Title
Title
Alcohol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 9 NV: 18 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 9 NV: 18 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Act No. 167 | |
2020-10-07 | Effective date 09/29/20 | |
2020-09-29 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 162 | |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-2 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2020-09-22 | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. McCravy, GM Smith, and Stavrinakis | |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-40 |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2020-09-22 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2020-09-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-9 |
2020-09-16 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-16 | House | Amended |
2020-09-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-06-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-05-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-2 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Amended |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Turner (ch), Hutto, Talley, Cash, Harpootlian |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 4 | 1515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 4 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 4 | 730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |