SC S0985 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Recognize March 5, 2024, As "disability Advocacy Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Disability Advocacy Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on ERROR - BLANK SPONSOR |
2024-01-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced |