SC S0980 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 44-21-80, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Regional Tertiary Level Developmental Evaluation Centers, So As To Update The Names Of Those Authorized To Fulfill The Role Of Regional Tertiary Level Developmental Evaluation Centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tertiary level developmental evaluation centers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2020-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-03-11SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-03-10SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2020-03-10SenateRead second time
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2020-01-30SenatePolled out of committee Medical Affairs
2020-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
442180(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback