SC S0978 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Invite All South Carolinians To Participate In "national Wear Red Day" On Friday, February 2, 2024, During American Heart Month And To Encourage All Citizens Of South Carolina To Join Together In Reaffirming Our Commitment To Fighting Cardiovascular Disease In Women Throughout This Great State.
Title
National Wear Red Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |