SC S0977 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adopt Revised Code Volumes 11a And 20 Of The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To The Extent Of Their Contents, As The Only General Permanent Statutory Law Of The State As Of January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To adopt revised Code Volumes 11A and 20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
2020-05-12SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-03-12SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2020-03-12SenateRead second time
2020-03-10SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback