SC S0975 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delete A Prohibition Of The Serving Of Consecutive Terms By The Chairman, To Provide The Governor May Reappoint A Chairman, And To Provide Members Appointed To The Workers' Compensation Commission Are Subject To Removal By The Governor In Certain Circumstances
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 23 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Act No. 140 | |
2016-03-16 | Effective date 03/14/16 | |
2016-03-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-03-10 | Ratified R 144 | |
2016-03-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-1 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory (ch), Coleman, Turner |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |