SC S0974 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Pedestrian Bridge In The City Of Orangeburg That Crosses Chestnut Street The "dr. Emily England Clyburn Pedestrian Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.
Title
Dr. Emily England Clyburn Pedestrian Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |