SC S0953 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Article 7, Chapter 3, Title 57 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Powers And Duties Of The Department Of Transportation, To Provide That A Road, Bridge, Or Other Highway Facility Shall Not Be Dedicated And Named In Honor Of A Living Person, And To Provide For The Removal Of The Names Of Certain Individuals From A Road, Bridge, Or Other Highway Facility; And To Amend Chapter 1, Title 10 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Public Buildings And Property, To Provide That A Public Building Shall Not Be Dedicated And Named In Honor Of A Living Person, And To Provide For The Removal Of The Names Of Certain Individuals From A Public Building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Road and Bridge namings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-12-11SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-12-11SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0893 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance
H4958 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback