SC S0944 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Roll call Ayes-16 Nays-22
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Roll call Ayes-16 Nays-22
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Use Of State House Lobbies, Steps, And Other Public Buildings And Grounds, To Require That The Department Of Administration Create A Permit Process For Events And Demonstrations On The State House Grounds; To Amend Section 10-11-310 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Definition Of Capitol Grounds, To Add Pendleton Street To The Definition; And To Amend Section 10-11-330 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Unauthorized Entry Into The Capitol Building, To Make It Unlawful To Incite Physical Violence Or Engage In Activities That Encourage Unlawful Conduct, And To Allow Law Enforcement To Remove And Disburse Persons That Cause A Threat To Public Security, Health, Or Well-being.
Title
Use of State House and State House Grounds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 16 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-16 Nays-22 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Third Reading Failed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 11 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 11 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |