SC S0932 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To The Construction Of The State Highway System, By Adding Section 57-5-880, To Provide That An Entity Undertaking A Transportation Improvement Project Shall Bear The Costs Related To Relocating Water And Sewer Lines; To Provide The Requirements For Utilities To Be Eligible For Relocation Payments; And To Define Necessary Terms.
Title
State highway system
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Campbell [R] | Sen. Greg Hembree [R] | Sen. Sean Bennett [R] | Sen. Kent Williams [D] |
Sen. Lawrence Grooms [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-04-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0343 (Similar To) 2017-02-01 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
H3739 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
H3739 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works