SC S0931 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To Campaign Bank Accounts, To Provide That All Contributions Received By Candidates Shall Be Deposited Into An Interest On Campaign Account Known As An "ioca," To Provide That An Ioca Benefits The State Ethics Commission, To Provide That An Ioca Shall Be Established With An Eligible Institution That Voluntarily Chooses To Participate, To Provide For The Rate Of Interest Or Dividends Payable On Any Ioca, To Provide That One Percent Of All Contributions Deposited Into An Ioca Shall Be Remitted To Benefit The Commission, And To Provide That The Funds Remitted To The Commission Pursuant To This Section Shall Be Used By The Commission To Create A Position Or Positions Within Its Employ To Check And Confirm The Completeness Of Candidate Filings; To Amend Section 8-13-320 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Duties And Powers Of The State Ethics Commission, To Provide That Those Duties And Responsibilities Include Receiving, Administering, Investing, Disbursing, And Separately Accounting For Funds Remitted To It Pursuant To Section 8-13-1312; To Amend Section 8-13-340 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Annual Report Of The State Ethics Commission, To Provide That The State Ethics Commission At The Close Of Each Fiscal Year Shall Report To The General Assembly And The Governor Concerning The Action It Has Taken, The Names, Salaries, And Duties Of All Persons In Its Employ, The Money It Has Disbursed, And The Amount Of Funds It Has Received From Iocas And That The Commission Shall Also Make Other Reports On Matters Within Its Jurisdiction And Recommendations For Further Legislation As May Appear Desirable; And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign bank accounts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0766 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0915 (Similar To) 2018-01-23 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8131312(n/a)See Bill Text
813320(n/a)See Bill Text
813340(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback