SC S0930 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-26-85, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To An Increase In Pay For Teachers Certified By The National Board For Professional Teaching Standards, So As To Provide That Teachers Receiving Certification Before July 1, 2010, Shall Receive An Increase In Pay For Two Ten-year Renewals, And To Provide That Teachers Receiving Certification After June 30, 2010, Shall Receive An Increase In Pay For The Initial Ten Years Of The Certification And No More Than One Ten Year Renewal.
Title
National Board Certified teachers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0930&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/930_20191211.htm |