SC S0928 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delineate The Conditions Under Which Special Purpose Districts May Transfer Ownership Of Works Of Art Acquired By Gift, Bequest, Purchase, Or By Other Means To Nonprofit Corporations Organized For The Purpose Of Displaying Works Of Art
Title
Special purpose districts, transfer of art to nonprofits
Sponsors
Sen. John Scott [D] | Sen. Darrell Jackson [D] | Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] | Sen. Paul Campbell [R] |
Sen. Kevin Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 202 | |
2018-05-24 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 220 | |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-10 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-09 | House | Amended |
2018-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), McLeod, Senn |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |