SC S0918 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide An Exception For Purposes Of Practitioner Prescription Report Cards
Title
Opioid prescriptions, limits, prescription report cards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: To Continue Motion To Carry Over (Y: 14 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: To Continue Motion To Carry Over (Y: 14 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 201 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date See Act | |
2018-05-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 219 | |
2018-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2018-04-25 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2018-04-24 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-24 | House | Amended |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 33 | 34 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 965 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 1630 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 1640 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 1645 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 1650 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 1655 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 1665 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 1680 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |