SC S0917 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Us 701 Bridge Over The Great Pee Dee River The "charles A. Hinson Memorial Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Signs Or Markers At This Location Containing The Designation.
Title
Charles A Hinson Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Introduced |