SC S0916 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Act No. 268
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Act No. 268
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raise Age Limitations To Conform With Sections 63-3-510 And 63-19-20; And To Require Certain State Agencies To Collect Data And Submit A Report Addressing The Fiscal Impact Of Raising The Age That A Person Is Considered A Child For Purposes Of Delinquency Matters Before The Family Court
Title
Juvenile Justice Code definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Act No. 268 | |
2016-06-16 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2016-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 227 | |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2016-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-04 | House | Amended |
2016-05-03 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-05-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2016-04-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Campsen, Hembree |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 19 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 1210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 1410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 1420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 1440 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 1850 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 2050 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 3 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |