SC S0913 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Noon On Wednesday, February 2, 2022, As The Time To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Supreme Court, Seat 4, Whose Term Will Expire July 31, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 5, To Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2027; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 9, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, First Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Upon His Retirement On Or Before June 30, 2022, And The Successor Will Serve A New Term Of That Office, Which Will Expire June 30, 2028; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, First Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Second Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Third Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Fourth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Fifth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Upon His Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2022, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2024; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Sixth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Eighth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 4, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Sixteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Sixteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, First Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Upon His Retirement On Or Before June 30, 2022, And The Successor Will Fill A New Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2028; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Second Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Third Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fourth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fourth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, To Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2026; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fifth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fifth Judicial Circuit, Seat 4, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Seventh Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Eighth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Ninth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Ninth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Tenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Eleventh Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Twelfth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, To Fill A New Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2028; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 4, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 6, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fifteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fifteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Upon His Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2022, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2026; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Sixteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022; And To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Administrative Law Court, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2022.
Title
Judicial Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
H4746 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0913&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/913_20211206.htm |