SC S0911 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Repeal Section 56-15-110(2) And To Amend The Procedural Process For A Person To Bring A Claim In An Individual Capacity Under The Dealer's Act In Section 56-15-110(1); And To Clarify The Current Procedural Process In State Law For A Motor Vehicle To Bring Action Or Claim For Damage And Harm To Its Business Or Property By The Manufacturer, Distributor, Or Other Person By Amending Section 56-15-30.
Title
Closing fees on motor vehicle sales contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Hutto, Massey |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 15 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 15 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |