SC S0910 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 518 Of 1982, As Amended, Relating To The Composition Of The Berkeley County School District Board Of Education, So As To Provide That Eight Board Members Shall Be Elected In Nonpartisan Elections From Single-member Districts In Which They Are Residents, Coterminous With County Council Districts And Sharing The Corresponding District Numbers; To Provide That One Member Shall Be Elected From The County At Large; To Stagger The Members' Terms Of Office; And To Repeal Section 3a Of Act 518 Of 1982 Relating To The Berkeley County School District Board Of Education Single-member Election Districts. - Ratified Title
Title
Berkeley County School Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Table Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 17 N: 70 NV: 5 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate On Bill (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate On Amendment Number 1 (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Table Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 17 N: 70 NV: 5 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate On Bill (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate On Amendment Number 1 (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | Act No. 251 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/18/22 | |
2022-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 177 | |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-04-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-69 Nays-31 |
2022-04-26 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-26 | House | Amended |
2022-04-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Berkeley Delegation |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Berkeley Delegation |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |