SC S0909 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The Marion County Council To Postpone For One Additional Year The Implementation Of Its Countywide Property Tax Equalization And Reassessment Program For The 2023 Tax Year.
Title
Marion County Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |