SC S0897 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-11)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-11)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Remove References To The South Carolina Infantry Battle Flag Of The Confederate States Of America, To Provide For The Permanent Removal Of The South Carolina Infantry Battle Flag Of The Confederate States Of America From Its Location Adjacent To The Confederate Soldier Monument, And To Provide That Upon Its Removal, The South Carolina Infantry Battle Flag Of The Confederate States Of America Shall Be Transported To The Confederate Relic Room For Appropriate Display
Title
SC Infantry Battle Flag of the Confederate States of America
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - House - House: Table Reconsideration Motion (Y: 70 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment (Y: 57 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-07-08 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 3 N: 111 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-07-07 - House - House: Motion To Recall From Judiciary (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - House - House: Table Motion To Recall From Judiciary (Y: 21 N: 91 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - House - House: Table Reconsideration Motion (Y: 70 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment (Y: 57 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-07-08 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 3 N: 111 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-07-07 - House - House: Motion To Recall From Judiciary (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - House - House: Table Motion To Recall From Judiciary (Y: 21 N: 91 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Act No. 90 | |
2015-07-14 | Effective date 07/09/15 | |
2015-07-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-07-09 | Ratified R 132 | |
2015-07-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-20 |
2015-07-09 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-07-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-27 |
2015-07-08 | House | Read second time |
2015-07-07 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2015-07-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-07-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-3 |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-3 |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-06-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-06-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
H4365 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4366 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4366 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary