SC S0891 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Read third time and sent to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 61-4-90(a), Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Transfer Of Beer Or Wine For Underage Person's Consumption, So As To Provide That Compliance Testing Must Be Under The Direct Supervision Of A Law Enforcement Agency And The Agency Must Have The Person's Parental Consent; To Amend Section 61-6-4070(a), Relating To The Transfer To Person Under The Age Of Twenty-one Years, So As To Provide That Compliance Testing Must Be Under The Direct Supervision Of A Law Enforcement Agency And The Agency Must Have The Person's Parental Consent; To Repeal Section 61-4-100, Relating To Criminal Charges Brought Against Both A Seller And Purchaser; And To Repeal Section 61-6-4085, Relating To Charges Against A Seller And Minor Purchaser.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol; transfer for underage consumption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-05-12SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
2020-05-12SenateRead second time
2020-05-12SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-03-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-11SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2020-02-14SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Turner (ch), Hutto, Talley, Cash, Harpootlian
2020-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-12-11SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-12-11SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
614100(n/a)See Bill Text
61490(n/a)See Bill Text
6164070(n/a)See Bill Text
6164085(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback