SC S0891 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 199
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Include Safe Sleep Practices And The Causes Of Sudden Unexpected Infant Death Syndrome In The Information That Must Be Provided

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Newborns, information available to parents, safe sleep practices and causes of SUID

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31 Act No. 199
2018-05-23 Effective date See Act
2018-05-15 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 217
2018-05-03HouseRead third time and enrolled
2018-05-02HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2018-05-02HouseRead second time
2018-04-25HouseCommittee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-03-20HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-03-20HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-08SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-03-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-07SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2018-03-07SenateRead second time
2018-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-03-02 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-01SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
443750(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback