SC S0888 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Make Conforming Changes.
Title
Academic Standards Accountability Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Education |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 18 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 355 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |